AZ HB2477 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil forfeiture; report information; remedies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil forfeiture; report information; remedies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12SenateChapter 149
2017-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-10HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (55-1-4-0)
2017-04-10HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-03HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-04-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-23SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-14HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
132314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69488
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2477p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2477h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2477s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0149.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2477farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2477judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2477floorburges.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69488&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69488&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69488&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=175643&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=175597&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69488&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69488&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=176804&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=176810&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=176886&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69488&billStatusActionId=176887&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback