AZ HB2477 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle equipment; inspections; farm implements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle equipment; inspections; farm implements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27 Governor Signed
2012-03-26 Transmitted to Governor
2012-03-22 Transmit to House
2012-03-22 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2012-03-19 Senate Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 1:25 PM
2012-03-19 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-19 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-19 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2012-03-05 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-03-12 Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0)
2012-03-06 Referred to Senate NRT Committee
2012-03-06 Senate read second time
2012-03-05 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-03-05 Assigned to Senate NRT Committee
2012-03-05 Introduced in Senate and read first time
2012-03-02 Transmit to Senate
2012-03-01 House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-4-0)
2012-03-01 House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2012-02-28 House majority caucus: Do pass
2012-02-28 House minority caucus: Do pass
2012-02-27 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2012-01-17 Referred to House RULES Committee
2012-02-16 House AW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2012-01-17 Referred to House AW Committee
2012-01-26 House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0)
2012-01-18 Referred to House TRANS Committee
2012-01-18 House read second time
2012-01-17 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-01-17 Assigned to House AW Committee
2012-01-17 Assigned to House TRANS Committee
2012-01-17 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback