AZ HB2476 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Trauma-informed care training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trauma-informed care training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8503.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69487
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2476p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2476h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.24760205.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.24760300.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2476hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2476rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69487&billStatusActionId=175692&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69487&billStatusActionId=175665&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69487&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback