AZ HB2460 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter schools; vacant buildings; equipment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools; vacant buildings; equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateChapter 85
2018-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-05HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15189Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70421
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2460p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2460h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0085.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70421&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70421&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70421&billStatusActionId=180924&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70421&billStatusActionId=180941&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70421&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70421&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70421&billStatusActionId=182502&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70421&billStatusActionId=182562&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback