AZ HB2459 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Manslaughter; suicide assistance; violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manslaughter; suicide assistance; violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateChapter 46
2021-03-17SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-11HouseHouse concurs
2021-03-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-11HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-03-10HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-03-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-04SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75051
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2459p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2459h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2459s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0046.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2459pratt.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2459judiciary.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2459petersen0208.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482459
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483312
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485523
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486182
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486853
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486907
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488607
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75051&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75051&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=200610&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=200636&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75051&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75051&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=203002&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=203006&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=203071&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75051&billStatusActionId=203362&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback