AZ HB2454 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual assault; rental agreement termination
Title
Sexual assault; rental agreement termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |