AZ HB2453 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land use plans; contents; aggregates
Title
Land use plans; contents; aggregates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 212 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-02-28 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2019-02-27 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Geological Survey
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Municipalities
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Municipalities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 461.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |