AZ HB2452 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Underground storage tanks; performance standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Underground storage tanks; performance standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-11SenateSenate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback