AZ HB2452 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle emissions program; remote inspections
Title
Vehicle emissions program; remote inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 141 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-5-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Department Of Transportation
Governor's Office
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Pilot Programs
Reporting
The Environment - Title 49
Vehicle Emissions
Vehicle Inspections
Governor's Office
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Pilot Programs
Reporting
The Environment - Title 49
Vehicle Emissions
Vehicle Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |