AZ HB2452 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; certificate of title
Title
Technical correction; certificate of title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (32-24-4-0) | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |