AZ HB2446 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special plates; military; women veterans
Title
Special plates; military; women veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Chapter 229 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2019-05-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (54-3-3-0) |
2019-05-07 | House | House Conference adopted |
2019-05-07 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2019-04-25 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conference members: LIVINGSTON, GOWAN, PESHLAKAI |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conference members: GRIFFIN, ANDRADE, NUTT |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conference appointed |
2019-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2463 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |