AZ HB2443 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; sex; race selection; prohibition
Title
Abortion; sex; race selection; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-03-23 | House final reading , voting: (35-20-5-0) | |
2011-03-23 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-21 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-5-4-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-21 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-21 | House third reading , voting: (41-18-1-0) | |
2011-02-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |