AZ HB2442 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Highway safety fee repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway safety fee repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282007Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411752Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback