AZ HB2436 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Regents; designees
Title
Regents; designees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |