AZ HB2430 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; free library system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; free library system

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 255
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-07 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-07SenateTransmit to House
2016-05-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2016-04-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-23SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-02SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2016-02-24SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-24SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-23SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-19HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2016-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2016-01-25HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-11HouseHouse GHE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2016-01-26HouseReferred to House GHE Committee
2016-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-25HouseAssigned to House GHE Committee
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2430
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0255.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2430thorpe.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2430government and higher education.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430.hghe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2430.sthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback