AZ HB2425 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor carriers; violations; penalties
Title
Motor carriers; violations; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 112 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5245 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |