AZ HB2419 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited transaction fees; municipalities
Title
Prohibited transaction fees; municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |