AZ HB2413 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender registration; online identifiers
Title
Sex offender registration; online identifiers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 83 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |