AZ HB2412 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Open meetings; digital recordings
Title
Open meetings; digital recordings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |