AZ HB2406 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Referred to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Referred to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure requirements; medical board
Title
Licensure requirements; medical board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-21 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |