AZ HB2405 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - House third reading FAILED voting: (36-23-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - House third reading FAILED voting: (36-23-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; cultivation; facilities
Title
Medical marijuana; cultivation; facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |