AZ HB2403 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - House third reading None voting: (35-25-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Clean elections; contributions prohibited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean elections; contributions prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading None voting: (35-25-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16948Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16959Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback