AZ HB2402 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restricted licenses; driving violations; penalties
Title
Restricted licenses; driving violations; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Drew John [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Criminal Code
Driver Licenses
Public Health And Safety
Restricted Licenses
Transportation
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings
Driver Licenses
Public Health And Safety
Restricted Licenses
Transportation
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 611 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |