AZ HB2402 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds; disclosure; notice
Title
Bonds; disclosure; notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |