AZ HB2398 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Illegal substances education; partnership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Illegal substances education; partnership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20 Governor Vetoed
2018-04-19 Transmitted to Governor
2018-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-17HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-17HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-11HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-03-14SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15708New CodeSee Bill Text
362803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36772Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41115New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70191
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2398p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2398h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2398s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2398carter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2398health.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2398floorbarto.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70191&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70191&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=182409&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=182412&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70191&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70191&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=183004&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=183220&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=183318&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70191&billStatusActionId=183328&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback