AZ HB2389 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public nuisance; noise; evidence
Title
Public nuisance; noise; evidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |