AZ HB2387 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to Senate FIN Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to Senate FIN Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Improvement districts; lighting; streets; parks
Title
Improvement districts; lighting; streets; parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |