AZ HB2383 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Domestic violence; arrest; predominant aggressor
Title
Domestic violence; arrest; predominant aggressor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |