AZ HB2382 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1259
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mobile home parks; caregivers.
Title
Mobile home parks; caregivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1259 (Replaced by) 2021-02-18 - Chapter 31
Subjects
Arizona Mobile Home Parks Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Caregivers
Mobile Home Parks
Property - Title 33
Caregivers
Mobile Home Parks
Property - Title 33
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1413.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |