AZ HB2382 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Towing; driving on suspended license
Title
Towing; driving on suspended license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House PS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |