AZ HB2367 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; residency documentation; policies
Title
Schools; residency documentation; policies
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-4-0-2-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House FR Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House FR Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |