AZ HB2362 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; ballot privacy folders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; ballot privacy folders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (47-11-2-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16579Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74891
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2362p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2362h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2362jermaine.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2362government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482471
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482970
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485748
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486467
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74891&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74891&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74891&billStatusActionId=201684&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74891&billStatusActionId=201754&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74891&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74891&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback