AZ HB2361 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senate CEM Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senate CEM Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; provider payments; limitations
Title
Workers' compensation; provider payments; limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Held |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | House IR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |