AZ HB2359 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

License denial prohibited; drug convictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License denial prohibited; drug convictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-12SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
2020-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-03HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411093.06New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73019
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2359p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2359h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2359grantham.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2359regulatory affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73019&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73019&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73019&billStatusActionId=193579&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73019&billStatusActionId=194012&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73019&billStatusActionId=194015&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73019&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73019&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback