AZ HB2356 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; nonparticipatory employer liability.
Title
ASRS; nonparticipatory employer liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1053 (Replaced by) 2021-02-18 - Chapter 29
Subjects
Arizona State Retirement System
Asrs
Nonparticipatory Employer Liability
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Asrs
Nonparticipatory Employer Liability
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38