AZ HB2356 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile court; jurisdiction; age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court; jurisdiction; age

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 301
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-30HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-04-30HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-12HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70154
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2356p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2356h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2356s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0301.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2356farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2356judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.23560338.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2356jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2356floorburges1.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70154&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70154&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=181465&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=181545&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=181592&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70154&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70154&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=182654&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=182694&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=183102&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=183442&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70154&billStatusActionId=183432&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback