AZ HB2353 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory boards; sunrise; draft legislation
Title
Regulatory boards; sunrise; draft legislation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Held |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-3-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |