AZ HB2327 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle; definition; exclusion; insurance
Title
Motor vehicle; definition; exclusion; insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-21 | House | House final reading , voting: (28-27-5-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-0-7-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |