AZ HB2314 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Naturopathic physicians; services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naturopathic physicians; services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06HouseHouse HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
131415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15843Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
361673Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36663Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36664Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72962
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2314p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2314h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2314barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2314barto2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2314health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72962&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72962&billStatusActionId=193730&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72962&billStatusActionId=193792&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback