AZ HB2309 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Detained juveniles; advisements; notifications
Title
Detained juveniles; advisements; notifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 375 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (49-0-11-0) |
2022-06-24 | House | House concurs |
2022-06-24 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-24 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-0-7-0) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-6-2-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Advisement
Child Safety - Title 8
Detained Juveniles
Juvenile Offenders
Notification
Temporary Custody (s)
Child Safety - Title 8
Detained Juveniles
Juvenile Offenders
Notification
Temporary Custody (s)