AZ HB2307 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Anatomical gifts; procurement organizations; licensure
Title
Anatomical gifts; procurement organizations; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Chapter 292 | |
2016-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | House final reading , voting: (45-8-7-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-1-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |