AZ HB2305 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle dealers; franchise regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle dealers; franchise regulations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateChapter 182
2018-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-28HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
284301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284458Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284460Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70085
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2305p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2305h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2305s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0182.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.23050423.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2305transit.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=181256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=181352&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=181420&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=182649&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=182746&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=183055&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70085&billStatusActionId=183070&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback