AZ HB2304 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter guide; publicity pamphlet; e-mail
Title
Voter guide; publicity pamphlet; e-mail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 216 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-3-8-0) |
2017-04-24 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-18 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Citizens Clean Elections Commission
Clean Elections
Department Of Transportation
Elections And Electors
Initiative, Referendum And Recall
Prop 105
Publicity Pamphlets
Secretary Of State
Citizens Clean Elections Commission
Clean Elections
Department Of Transportation
Elections And Electors
Initiative, Referendum And Recall
Prop 105
Publicity Pamphlets
Secretary Of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |