AZ HB2302 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Election lawsuits; settlements; approvals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election lawsuits; settlements; approvals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16410.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74763
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2302p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2302h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2302kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2302government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483459
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484993
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486748
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74763&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74763&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74763&billStatusActionId=202671&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74763&billStatusActionId=202682&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback