AZ HB2302 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to Senate CEM Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to Senate CEM Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation premiums; payment
Title
Workers' compensation premiums; payment
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House IR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |