AZ HB2300 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Firearms; prohibited governmental activities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; prohibited governmental activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2016-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-15SenateSenate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-29HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2016-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0)
2016-01-21HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-17HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0-0)
2016-01-25HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2016-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-21HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback