AZ HB2291 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Empowerment scholarships accounts; expansion
Title
Empowerment scholarships accounts; expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |