AZ HB2285 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Interstate 10; Jackrabbit Trail
Title
Appropriation; Interstate 10; Jackrabbit Trail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Cook to inc Cook flr amend - fail on RCV (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2285 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2285 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Representative Cook to include the TI committee amendment (withdrawal APPROP committee amendment) Representative Salman 2nd RCV (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Cook to inc Cook flr amend - fail on RCV (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2285 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Motion Representative Cook motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2285 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Representative Cook to include the TI committee amendment (withdrawal APPROP committee amendment) Representative Salman 2nd RCV (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-22 | House | House motion to amend |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-1-2-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Appropriation
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Freeway Interchange
I-10
Jackrabbit Trail
Appropriation
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Freeway Interchange
I-10
Jackrabbit Trail