AZ HB2274 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Arizona power authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arizona power authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-03-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-03-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
30201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
30203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
30204Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71385
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2274p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2274h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71385&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71385&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71385&billStatusActionId=186573&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71385&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71385&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71385&billStatusActionId=188660&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback