AZ HB2274 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

County contributions; hospitalization; medical; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County contributions; hospitalization; medical; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-19HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback